NY S02540 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a business must provide notification of a data breach within 15 days of such breach; includes the department of financial services to the list of entities that must be notified of a data breach that affects any New York resident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a business must provide notification of a data breach within 15 days of such breach; includes the department of financial services to the list of entities that must be notified of a data breach that affects any New York resident.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.556
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback