NY S02578 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study regarding ecological literacy and healthy living curriculum in schools, and to provide recommendations in a report.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study regarding ecological literacy and healthy living curriculum in schools, and to provide recommendations in a report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.128 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01242 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education