NY S02592 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2592B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2592B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the amount of employer contributions to the state retirement system; authorizes an annual increase in employer contribution of the lesser of two percent or an inflation factor.
Title
Limits the amount of employer contributions to the state retirement system; authorizes an annual increase in employer contribution of the lesser of two percent or an inflation factor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2592B |
2014-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2592A |
2013-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07104 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - print number 7104a