NY S02612 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the taxation of state land in the county of Westchester.
Title
Authorizes the taxation of state land in the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1483 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00026 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation