NY S02613 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the taxation of state land in the county of Dutchess.
Title
Authorizes the taxation of state land in the county of Dutchess.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.931 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2613A |
2019-02-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06090 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation