NY S02647 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the offense of defrauding the government in the first degree and expands the definition of conspiracy in the fourth degree; relates to expanding the definition of tax fraud acts.
Title
Creates the offense of defrauding the government in the first degree and expands the definition of conspiracy in the fourth degree; relates to expanding the definition of tax fraud acts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.981 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07408 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes