NY S02649 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2649B
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the governor's tax expenditure reporting to include an enumeration of all fossil fuel related tax expenditures; imposes a 3 year expiration upon any fossil fuel related tax expenditures enacted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the governor's tax expenditure reporting to include an enumeration of all fossil fuel related tax expenditures; imposes a 3 year expiration upon any fossil fuel related tax expenditures enacted.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 2649B
2019-06-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2019-02-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 2649A
2019-02-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A00257 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - print number 257b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback