NY S02655 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.680
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits smoking in public parks; sets $50 fine; defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits smoking in public parks; sets $50 fine; defines terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.680
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a2299b
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2655B
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2655A
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.834
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A02299 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2655b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback