NY S02679 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits any business from charging a price for goods of a substantially similar or like kind on the basis of a person's gender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits any business from charging a price for goods of a substantially similar or like kind on the basis of a person's gender.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.220
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00629 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback