NY S02680 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the use of campaign funds for childcare expenses where they are incurred in the campaign or in the execution of the duties of public office or party position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the use of campaign funds for childcare expenses where they are incurred in the campaign or in the execution of the duties of public office or party position.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.486
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a1108b
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-06-11AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2680A
2019-06-05SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-22Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.614
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01108 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s2680a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02680
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02680A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2680#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2680#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2680#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback