NY S02682 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the flood mitigation and prevention task force to evaluate ways of protecting communities and residents of the state from flooding.
Title
Establishes the flood mitigation and prevention task force to evaluate ways of protecting communities and residents of the state from flooding.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.251 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1758 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2682 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | rules report cal.282 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-16 | Senate | print number 7456a |
2019-05-16 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-05-03 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7456A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1758 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07456 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled