NY S02719 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 2719A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 2719A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2016.
Title
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2016.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2719A |
2016-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01627 (Same As) 2016-03-31 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT