NY S02719 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for failure to execute and file satisfied judgments of $5,000 or more with court clerk from $100 to $500.
Title
Increases penalties for failure to execute and file satisfied judgments of $5,000 or more with court clerk from $100 to $500.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.227 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.47 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted for a1026 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.142 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.276 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | substituted for a1026 |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.468 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01026 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.227