NY S02724 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
Pending: Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
Pending: Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from transporting, holding, buying, selling, giving, receiving or marketing a nonambulatory animal unless such animal is first humanely euthanized without undue delay from the time that such animal becomes nonambulatory; makes certain exceptions; provides violation provisions; and defines relevant terms.
Title
Prohibits any person from transporting, holding, buying, selling, giving, receiving or marketing a nonambulatory animal unless such animal is first humanely euthanized without undue delay from the time that such animal becomes nonambulatory; makes certain exceptions; provides violation provisions; and defines relevant terms.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2724B |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2724A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.999 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A05711 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture