NY S02734 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to liability of members for wages due to laborers, servants or employees by domestic and foreign limited liability companies.
Title
Relates to liability of members for wages due to laborers, servants or employees by domestic and foreign limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.620 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.367 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2734 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-03-11 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.97 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-12 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A453 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.367 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00453 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.620