NY S02751 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 434 in the county of Tioga as the "Ronald Reagan Memorial Parkway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 434 in the county of Tioga as the "Ronald Reagan Memorial Parkway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.245 |
2012-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2751A |
2012-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.603 |
2011-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03985 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - held for consideration in transportation