NY S02751 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the development and implementation of an interface between the department of motor vehicles and the state police for the purpose of comparing information submitted by individuals engaging in in-person, mail or internet transactions with the department of motor vehicles to open criminal warrants.
Title
Relates to the development and implementation of an interface between the department of motor vehicles and the state police for the purpose of comparing information submitted by individuals engaging in in-person, mail or internet transactions with the department of motor vehicles to open criminal warrants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06642 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to transportation