NY S02755 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits physical contact or activity in any organization's initiating ceremony.
Title
Prohibits physical contact or activity in any organization's initiating ceremony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5200 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1409 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05200 (Same As) 2018-08-13 - signed chap.188