NY S02759 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale or transfer of certain real property by the state or public authorities; requires mandatory review by the attorney general and comptroller of the sale of certain real property; requires notice to members of the legislature and county executives in districts and counties in which land subject to transfer is located of the proposed transfer of state property between state departments, divisions, bureaus, agencies, state agencies, or to a public authority or public benefit corporation.
Title
Relates to the sale or transfer of certain real property by the state or public authorities; requires mandatory review by the attorney general and comptroller of the sale of certain real property; requires notice to members of the legislature and county executives in districts and counties in which land subject to transfer is located of the proposed transfer of state property between state departments, divisions, bureaus, agencies, state agencies, or to a public authority or public benefit corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.776 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |