NY S02761 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of homicide by sale of an opiate controlled substance; makes such crime a class A-1 felony.
Title
Establishes the crime of homicide by sale of an opiate controlled substance; makes such crime a class A-1 felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.723 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.496 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03398 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes