NY S02785 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority to study and report on potentially hazardous structures and storage areas under elevated train tracks, and its commuter notification system.
Title
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority to study and report on potentially hazardous structures and storage areas under elevated train tracks, and its commuter notification system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.234 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.555 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7835a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1241 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2785A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07835 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.234