NY S02829 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5333A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5333A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a disabled person retrofit tax credit.
Title
Creates a disabled person retrofit tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5333A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1932 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2829A |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05333 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - tabled