NY S02833 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years old to 21 years old.
Title
Increases the age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years old to 21 years old.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | signed chap.100 |
2019-07-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.343 |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2833 |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.36 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | rules report cal.36 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-02 | Senate | print number 558a |
2019-03-02 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-02-28 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A558A |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.343 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00558 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - signed chap.100