NY S02838 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public schools in any city with a population over one million that have at least 25% of students practicing a religious faith with specific dietary restrictions to offer food options which meet such dietary restrictions.
Title
Requires public schools in any city with a population over one million that have at least 25% of students practicing a religious faith with specific dietary restrictions to offer food options which meet such dietary restrictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate New York City Education Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2838B |
2019-05-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2838A |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06335 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education