NY S02844 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to securing payment of wages for work already performed; creates a lien remedy for all employees; provides grounds for attachment; relates to procedures where employees may hold shareholders of non-publicly traded corporations personally liable for wage theft; relates to rights for victims of wage theft to hold the ten members with the largest ownership interests in a company personally liable for wage theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to securing payment of wages for work already performed; creates a lien remedy for all employees; provides grounds for attachment; relates to procedures where employees may hold shareholders of non-publicly traded corporations personally liable for wage theft; relates to rights for victims of wage theft to hold the ten members with the largest ownership interests in a company personally liable for wage theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading cal.372
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a486b
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2844B
2019-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2844A
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.492
2019-01-29SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A00486 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s2844b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02844
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02844A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02844B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2844#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2844#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02844&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback