NY S02846 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - DEFEATED IN INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - DEFEATED IN INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax on carbon-based fuels.
Title
Establishes a tax on carbon-based fuels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | DEFEATED IN INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00107 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means