NY S02846 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the payment of small business grants within one hundred twenty days of notification of such funding.
Title
Relates to requiring the payment of small business grants within one hundred twenty days of notification of such funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.123 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07309 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions