NY S02855 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2855A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2855A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases limitation on highway expenses in the town of Brookhaven, Suffolk county, from one million dollars to two million six hundred thousand dollars.
Title
Increases limitation on highway expenses in the town of Brookhaven, Suffolk county, from one million dollars to two million six hundred thousand dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2855A |
2020-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03088 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES