NY S02861 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that prepaid cellular telephone cards have the expiration date of the minutes purchased printed on the card in conspicuous print.
Title
Requires that prepaid cellular telephone cards have the expiration date of the minutes purchased printed on the card in conspicuous print.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.40 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.334 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.401 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a3327 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.326 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.527 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03327 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.40