NY S02873 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans smoking in adult care facilities.
Title
Bans smoking in adult care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.536 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03069 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health