NY S02884 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2884D
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2884C
2019-05-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2884B
2019-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.221
2019-02-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 2884A
2019-02-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-01-30SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A02611 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.335

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02884&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02884&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02884
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02884&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02884A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02884&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02884B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02884&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02884C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02884&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02884D

Bill Comments

feedback