NY S02898 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 2898A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 2898A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a defined contribution plan for all non-civil service appointees and elected officials of the New York state and local employees' retirement system who are not yet vested in a state retirement system or who are hired after the effective date of this section; authorizes elected officials to join such defined contribution plan; defines terms; provides for contributions to such defined contribution plan; authorizes the promulgation of any necessary rules and regulations.
Title
Establishes a defined contribution plan for all non-civil service appointees and elected officials of the New York state and local employees' retirement system who are not yet vested in a state retirement system or who are hired after the effective date of this section; authorizes elected officials to join such defined contribution plan; defines terms; provides for contributions to such defined contribution plan; authorizes the promulgation of any necessary rules and regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2898A |
2016-02-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04285 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - held for consideration in governmental employees