NY S02898 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits consumer reporting agencies from reporting adverse information in credit reports of certain furloughed federal government employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits consumer reporting agencies from reporting adverse information in credit reports of certain furloughed federal government employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.116
2019-01-30SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A05400 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - print number 5400a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback