NY S02904 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6926A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6926A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a permit for a vehicle owned by a municipality to not expire until such municipality removes such permitted vehicle from operation.
Title
Authorizes a permit for a vehicle owned by a municipality to not expire until such municipality removes such permitted vehicle from operation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6926A |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.759 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2904A |
2017-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06926 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.299