NY S02904 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2904C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2904C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to acknowledging the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery in the city of New York and the state of New York; establishes the New York state community commission on reparations remedies to examine the institution of slavery, subsequently de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination against African-Americans, the impact of these forces on living African-Americans and to make recommendations on appropriate remedies; makes an appropriation therefor; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Title
Relates to acknowledging the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery in the city of New York and the state of New York; establishes the New York state community commission on reparations remedies to examine the institution of slavery, subsequently de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination against African-Americans, the impact of these forces on living African-Americans and to make recommendations on appropriate remedies; makes an appropriation therefor; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2904C |
2020-07-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-06-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2904B |
2020-06-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2904A |
2019-04-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03080 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means