NY S02910 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-17 - PRINT NUMBER 2910C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 2910C
2018-08-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-06-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 2910B
2018-06-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 2910A
2018-01-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-03-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-03-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.435
2017-01-18SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02983 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - print number 2983b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback