NY S02915 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Cayuga county jail to be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Cayuga.
Title
Authorizes the Cayuga county jail to be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Cayuga.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1811 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-03 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2019-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2915A |
2019-02-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06350 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to correction