NY S02921 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to security and protection of New York national guard and air national guard recruiting centers; provides that personnel be permitted to carry a firearm.
Title
Relates to security and protection of New York national guard and air national guard recruiting centers; provides that personnel be permitted to carry a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.843 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2921A |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.421 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A06918 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations