NY S02937 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class E felony of dissemination of false missing child information.
Title
Establishes the class E felony of dissemination of false missing child information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED 2937A |
2012-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.871 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05269 (Same As) 2012-05-24 - print number 5269a