NY S02937 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows senior citizens previously approved for the enhanced school tax relief exemption, who have elected not to participate in the income verification program, to file a simplified renewal application annually; directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to prepare such simplified, short form for eligible senior citizens.
Title
Allows senior citizens previously approved for the enhanced school tax relief exemption, who have elected not to participate in the income verification program, to file a simplified renewal application annually; directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to prepare such simplified, short form for eligible senior citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2014-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.346 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.117 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |