NY S02938 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Title
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.581 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2938B |
2019-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2938A |
2019-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00794 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES