NY S02939 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2939A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2939A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "education equity act" which provides language assistance to parents or guardians who have children enrolled in public school and whose primary language is not English; defines terms; creates an annual language assistance plan to assess language needs in the district; requires the department of education to establish web pages detailing the rights of parents to translation services in each covered language; requires annual reports by each school district to the local board of education.
Title
Establishes the "education equity act" which provides language assistance to parents or guardians who have children enrolled in public school and whose primary language is not English; defines terms; creates an annual language assistance plan to assess language needs in the district; requires the department of education to establish web pages detailing the rights of parents to translation services in each covered language; requires annual reports by each school district to the local board of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2939A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02179 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - print number 2179a