NY S02958 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-03 - SIGNED CHAP.243
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires information on concussions and sub-concussive blows to be provided to all parents of children playing tackle football.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires information on concussions and sub-concussive blows to be provided to all parents of children playing tackle football.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.243
2019-09-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.597
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6968a
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to health
2019-04-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-08SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2958A
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.292
2019-01-31SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A06968 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2958a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback