NY S02961 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no motor vehicle repair shop shall repair a tire that would not pass New York state inspection.
Title
Provides that no motor vehicle repair shop shall repair a tire that would not pass New York state inspection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 2961 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2961A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00154 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.5