NY S02974 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the eligibility dates for a military service recognition scholarship to include certain conflicts beginning on and after June 1, 1982.
Title
Changes the eligibility dates for a military service recognition scholarship to include certain conflicts beginning on and after June 1, 1982.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2016-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.582 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.563 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06170 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to higher education