NY S02974 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 2974A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 2974A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reciprocity of debarments imposed under the federal Davis-Bacon Act.
Title
Relates to reciprocity of debarments imposed under the federal Davis-Bacon Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2974A |
2018-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.669 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01845 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.136