NY S02978 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires charter buses to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance of the motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires charter buses to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance of the motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.447
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a4417a
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2978A
2019-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.151
2019-01-31SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A04417 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s2978a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02978&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02978&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02978
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02978&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02978A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2978#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2978#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2978#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02978&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback