NY S02989 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - PRINT NUMBER 2989C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - PRINT NUMBER 2989C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax credit for farmers who use qualified biodiesel fuel for the sole operation of their farm equipment.
Title
Provides a tax credit for farmers who use qualified biodiesel fuel for the sole operation of their farm equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2989C |
2012-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2989B |
2012-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2989A |
2012-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07132 (Same As) 2012-05-30 - print number 7132c