NY S02989 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the infliction of excessive corporal punishment on a child.
Title
Relates to the infliction of excessive corporal punishment on a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.708 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02330 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to children and families