NY S02996 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Dominic Murray sudden cardiac arrest prevention act"; directs the commissioners of education and health to establish rules and regulations for the treatment and monitoring of students of school districts, boards of cooperative educational services and nonpublic schools who exhibit signs or symptoms of sudden cardiac arrest.
Title
Establishes the "Dominic Murray sudden cardiac arrest prevention act"; directs the commissioners of education and health to establish rules and regulations for the treatment and monitoring of students of school districts, boards of cooperative educational services and nonpublic schools who exhibit signs or symptoms of sudden cardiac arrest.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2996A |
2020-01-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04876 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - print number 4876a